U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:00-cv-00069
  • Case Name: MAINE PEOPLE'S ALLIA, et al v. HOLTRACHEM MFG CO, et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Order for Disbursement of Funds]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 11, 2022: [Judgment - Consent Decree]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Approval of Settlement]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Order for Disbursement of Funds]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Order for Disbursement of Funds]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [Order for Disbursement of Funds]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Order for Disbursement of Funds]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order]
  • April 30, 2021: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 23, 2021: [Order for Disbursement of Funds]
  • April 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order for Disbursement of Funds]
  • March 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • March 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Conference of Counsel]
  • March 17, 2021: [Order for Disbursement of Funds]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order for Disbursement of Funds]
  • March 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Order for Disbursement of Funds]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order for Disbursement of Funds]
  • January 13, 2021: [Order for Disbursement of Funds]
  • January 04, 2021: [Order for Disbursement of Funds]
December, 2020
  • December 10, 2020: [Order for Disbursement of Funds]
  • December 08, 2020: [Order for Disbursement of Funds]
November, 2020
  • November 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing]
  • November 02, 2020: [Order for Disbursement of Funds]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.