U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00306
  • Case Name: MURCHIE et al v. DUBIE et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Order]
  • July 26, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
April, 2021
  • April 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Order on Objection to Scheduling Order]
  • December 05, 2020: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.