U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00446
  • Case Name: WELCH v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • November 15, 2021: [SS Statement of Errors/Fact Sheet]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Procedural Order Re: SS Appeals]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2021
  • April 16, 2021: [Order]
February, 2021
  • February 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.