U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00050
  • Case Name: MAINE HUMAN RIGHTS COMMISSION et al v. WAL-MART STORES EAST LP
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Order]
  • August 05, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
June, 2021
  • June 02, 2021: [Order]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
March, 2021
  • March 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.