U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00040
  • Case Name: COURTHOUSE NEWS SERVICE et al v. GLESSNER et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Judgment]
  • July 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • July 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • March 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.