U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00004
  • Case Name: MUNDELL v. ACADIA HOSPITAL CORP et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Order of Recusal]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
August, 2021
  • August 05, 2021: [Order]
  • August 05, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
  • March 10, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.