U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00080
  • Case Name: BOULIER v. PENOBSCOT COUNTY JAIL et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Prosecution]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
June, 2021
  • June 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order for Service]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.