U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00062
  • Case Name: GAZZOLA v. THE STATE YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION OF MAINE et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
  • November 16, 2022: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Report of Conference of Counsel and Order]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Order]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
April, 2021
  • April 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.