U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00072
  • Case Name: WESCOTT et al v. MAINE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Report of Conference of Counsel and Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Appeal from Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Order]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.