U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cv-00173
  • Case Name: DREAM CAPITAL MANAGEMENT LLC v. DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Order]
  • January 06, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.