U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cv-00191
  • Case Name: RUSSELL v. CHENEVERT
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 16, 2023: [Order on Motion in Limine]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order]
  • September 16, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protection from Trial]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • August 02, 2022: [Report of Conference of Counsel and Order]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Objection to Scheduling Order]
  • December 08, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.