U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00194
  • Case Name: DINSMORE v. STATE OF MAINE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order]
  • March 10, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order on Objection to Scheduling Order]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.