U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00251
  • Case Name: DOMINGUEZ v. EASTERN MAINE HEALTHCARE SYSTEMS et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.