open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Massachusetts
    Case Number:1:18-cv-12299
    Party Name:Mattingly v. Warden Spaulding et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:June 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order To Show Cause]
    Date Published:April 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Order-2241 Petition]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mad.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?203846
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =