open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

MASSACHUSETTS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Massachusetts
    Case Number:19-40960
    Party Name:Stephen K Osei and Sheila A. Osei
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice [Order]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice [Order on Motion to Extend]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice [Amended Document]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice [Extend Time]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:June 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice [Request for Notice(s) (creditor event only)]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice [Signature Page]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice [Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mab.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?493396
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =