open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

MASSACHUSETTS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Massachusetts
    Case Number:1:19-cv-11861
    Party Name:Khelfaoui v. City of Lowell et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:January 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mad.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?213821
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =