open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

MASSACHUSETTS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts
    Case Number:1:19-cr-10337-2
    Party Name:USA v. Prandys Torres et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Report and Order on Final Status Conference by MJ]
    Date Published:February 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:January 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Report by Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order On Excludable Delay]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mad.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?214090
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =