open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

MASSACHUSETTS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Massachusetts
    Case Number:1:19-cv-12396
    Party Name:Wofse et al v. Horn et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Strike]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
    Date Published:January 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mad.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?216361
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =