U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-01062
  • Case Name: DeGiacomo v. Eydinov et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Certificate of Rule 26(f) Conference]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Affidavit of Service]
  • December 15, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Pre-Trial Order]
  • December 15, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 14, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 01, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Order on Motion For Preliminary Injunction]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Order on Motion for Real Estate Attachment]
  • November 29, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Supplemental Document]
  • November 29, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Order on Motion For Preliminary Injunction]
  • November 28, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Supplemental Document]
  • November 28, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Assent]
  • November 28, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 17, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • November 15, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 15, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 14, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Real Estate Attachment]
  • November 14, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • November 14, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Adversary Cover Sheet]
  • November 14, 2022: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.