U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-40831
  • Case Name: Larry R. Briggs
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Death]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice]
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Amended Document]
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Notice of Payment Change (No Proof of Claim Filed)]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Request for Notice(s) (creditor event only)]
  • December 05, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • November 22, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • November 22, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2]
  • November 22, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedule]
  • November 22, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Chapter 13 Agreement]
  • November 22, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • November 22, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities]
  • November 22, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • November 22, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Schedules (Original)]
  • November 22, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 22, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Order to Update]
  • November 21, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • November 21, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • November 21, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.