U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-11839
  • Case Name: Keely R Benoit
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Amended Document]
  • January 09, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Notice]
  • January 04, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Signature Page]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Order to Update]
  • December 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • December 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • December 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • December 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • December 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • December 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • December 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • December 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.