U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-40902
  • Case Name: Thomas Joseph Millier and Carrie Millier
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Financial Management Course]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Amend]
  • December 21, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Court's Order of Deficiency]
  • December 20, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Amend]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.