U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-40912
  • Case Name: Paul W. Munro
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Opposition]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 20, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Extend Time]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Domestic Support Obligations(Ch. 13 Certification)]
  • January 16, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • January 16, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • January 16, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • January 16, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities]
  • January 16, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • January 16, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Schedules (Original)]
  • January 16, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Evidence of Current and Sufficient Liability and Property Insurance]
  • January 03, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 03, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Extend Time]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 23, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice]
  • December 23, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Unfiled Prepetition Tax Returns]
  • December 23, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Notice of Unfiled Prepetition Tax Returns]
  • December 21, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Order to Update]
  • December 21, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • December 21, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Statement of Social Security Number]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.