U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-11844
  • Case Name: Michael Roth and Eileen Maldonado
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Extend Time]
  • January 23, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Notice]
  • January 18, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Request for Notice(s) (creditor event only)]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Extend Time]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Extend Time]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Order to Update]
  • December 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • December 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • December 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • December 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.