U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-30017
  • Case Name: Mellesha Mcintosh
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 23, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 18, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Unfiled Prepetition Tax Returns]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order to Update]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Social Security Number]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.