U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-10257-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Mendez et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Status Report]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 13, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2024
  • October 18, 2024: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • October 04, 2024: [Attorney Appearance Pro Bono]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.