U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-10024-6
  • Case Name: USA v. Gary Cederquist, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Transcript]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 06, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • May 05, 2025: [Procedural Order re Sentencing Hearing]
  • May 02, 2025: [Jury Verdict]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 01, 2025: [Continue]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Acquittal]
  • April 21, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 17, 2025: [Procedural Order re Sentencing Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Exhibit/Witness List]
  • April 14, 2025: [Procedural Order re Sentencing Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • April 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 13, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 13, 2025: [Rule 11 Hearing]
  • April 13, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 11, 2025: [Procedural Order re Sentencing Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Sever]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 07, 2025: [Opposition to Motion]
  • April 05, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 04, 2025: [Exhibit/Witness List]
  • April 04, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 04, 2025: [Sever]
  • April 02, 2025: [Trial Brief ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 01, 2025: [Rule 11 Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Trial Brief ]
  • March 31, 2025: [Exhibit/Witness List]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 28, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 21, 2025: [Procedural Order re Sentencing Hearing]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • March 18, 2025: [Response - unrelated to a motion]
  • March 15, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 15, 2025: [Opposition to Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Opposition to Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • March 14, 2025: [In Limine]
  • March 14, 2025: [Seal]
  • March 12, 2025: [Objection - unrelated to a motion]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 10, 2025: [Objection - unrelated to a motion]
  • March 08, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • March 03, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Memorandum in Support]
  • October 11, 2024: [Suppress]
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.