U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-10098-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thioub
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Pretrial Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • April 29, 2025: [Exclude]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Continue]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Pretrial Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.