U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-10252-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lankford et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Response to Court Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • April 10, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [Procedural Order re Sentencing Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Rule 11 Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Rule 11 Hearing]
November, 2024
  • November 17, 2024: [Detention]
  • November 17, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Letter- non-motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.