U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-11436
  • Case Name: Yassine El Kouram
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Supplemental Document]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order on Motion for Approval]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Extend Time]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Approve]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Stipulation]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Murphy, Harold B. [Financial Management Course]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.