U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-10466-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jimenez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 24, 2025: [Continue]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 10, 2024: [Brady Order]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.