U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-10192-1
  • Case Name: USA v. COLLAZO
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Rule 11 Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Rule 11 Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 13, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Status Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.