U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-10288-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rao
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice Canceling Hearing or Other Deadline]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 21, 2025: [Status Report]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 19, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Status Report]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 11, 2024: [Protective Order]
  • October 10, 2024: [Protective Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.