U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-10160-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Das
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Report and Order on Final Status Conference by MJ]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice of Rescheduling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.