U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-10172-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Lnu, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • April 09, 2025: [Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 09, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 08, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 01, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Show Cause re Revocation of Probation]
  • March 12, 2025: [Modification/Revocation of Probation]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Government Attorney]
December, 2024
  • December 04, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Pretrial Services/Probation - Request/Memo/Summons/Warrant]
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice of Rescheduling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.