U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-40445
  • Case Name: Peter Scott Hitchcock
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion To Limit/Shorten Notice]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Limit/Shorten Notice]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Compensation]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [13 Plan Modified]
January, 2025
  • January 20, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Limit/Shorten Notice]
October, 2024
  • October 18, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.