U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-41066
  • Case Name: Shabbar Raza Saiyed
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Withdrawal of Claim]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order Dismissing Case(Sua Sponte)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Application for Administrative Expenses]
April, 2025
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Administrative Expenses]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Withdraw Document]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Extend Time]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Extend Time]
October, 2024
  • October 24, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Extend Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.