U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-10079-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bhambi et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 15, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Abbreviated Electronic Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • March 20, 2025: [Subsequent Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 19, 2025: [Amended Judgment]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order For Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 17, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 17, 2025: [Abbreviated Electronic Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 14, 2025: [Judgment]
January, 2025
  • January 20, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
December, 2024
  • December 06, 2024: [Order]
  • December 01, 2024: [Exhibit/Witness List]
October, 2024
  • October 28, 2024: [Forfeiture of Property]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.