U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-40601
  • Case Name: Eric M. Burgess and Melinda M. Burgess
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [UST Compensation]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Order on Objection to Claim]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Report & Hearing Agenda]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Order on Motion to Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Order on Objection to Claim]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Report & Hearing Agenda]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
December, 2024
  • December 09, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Certificate of Service]
November, 2024
  • November 15, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Response]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.