U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-10073-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • March 27, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 17, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Transcript at Government Expense]
  • March 14, 2025: [Transcripts at government expense]
January, 2025
  • January 05, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • January 03, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
December, 2024
  • December 15, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • December 02, 2024: [Order on Motion for Clarification]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.