U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-41217
  • Case Name: Sharon L Gallagher
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Notice of Post/No-Post Petition Creditors]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Statement of Intent]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Chapter 13 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order to Update]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Order on Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goldsmith, Jonathan R. [Convert Case to 7]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion to Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Order on Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Objection]
December, 2024
  • December 09, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Request for Notice(s) (creditor event only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.