U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-41310
  • Case Name: Michael Pelletz
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Certificate of Conference]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Response]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Certificate of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Amend]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order (Generic)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Withdrawal of Document]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Notice of Claim filed under FRBP 3004 (Surrogate Claim)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order To Set Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges(Ch.13 Only)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order To Set Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Amend]
January, 2025
  • January 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Request for Notice(s) (creditor event only)]
December, 2024
  • December 28, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Evidence of Current and Sufficient Liability and Property Insurance]
  • December 26, 2024: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Chapter 13 Agreement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.