U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-mc-91645
  • Case Name: In Re Application for Order Enforcing a Subpoena
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Seal]
  • April 30, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • April 25, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 25, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Seal]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 14, 2025: [Clarification]
  • April 09, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Opposition to Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • April 07, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 07, 2025: [Motion to Quash]
  • April 07, 2025: [Vacate]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • March 26, 2025: [Amend]
  • March 24, 2025: [Memorandum & Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 19, 2025: [Opposition to Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • March 17, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 13, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2025
  • February 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.