U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-10142-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carlos Cardoso
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • April 15, 2025: [Excludable Delay]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • April 01, 2025: [Report and Order on Final Status Conference by MJ]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice Canceling Hearing or Other Deadline]
  • March 25, 2025: [Status Report]
February, 2025
  • February 24, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.