U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-10061-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Cuello-Reynoso, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Rule 11 Hearing]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Rule 11 Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Rule 11 Hearing]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order Of Detention]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order Canceling Deadline]
  • April 09, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 17, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • March 17, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 03, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.