U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40235
  • Case Name: Hector B Reyes Mejia
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Order on Motion To Extend Time for Credit Counseling]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Objection]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Order on Motion To Extend Time for Credit Counseling]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Extend Time for Credit Counseling]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Extend Time]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Extend Time]
  • March 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner-W, Gary M. [Order to Update]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.