U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-mj-01018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sharma
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Hearing for Initial Appearance]
  • April 10, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 10, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • March 20, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 07, 2025: [Notice Canceling Hearing or Other Deadline]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.