U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10405
  • Case Name: Frederick F Nafash
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Financial Management Course Certificate for AutoDocket Only]
  • March 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedule]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedule]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Court's Order of Deficiency]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Schedules (Original)]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Signature Page]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Statement of Intent]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • March 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cruickshank, Gary W. [Signature Page]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.