U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10423
  • Case Name: Chester E Graham, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Order on Motion to Convert Case To Chapter 13]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Order Dismissing Case(Sua Sponte)]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Brief Memorandum (in Opposition to or Support of)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Brief Memorandum (in Opposition to or Support of)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Objection]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Convert Case to 13]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Order (Generic)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Supplemental Document]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Verified Declaration of Schedules/Creditor Matrix]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Order on Motion to Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Supplemental Document]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Statement of Intent]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Schedules (Original)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Extend Time]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Desmond, John O. [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.