U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40127
  • Case Name: Zmetra Land Holdings, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Appear Telephonically or Via Video Conference]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order on Application for Compensation]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Appear Telephonically/Video Conference]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Small Business Monthly Operating Report]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Statement]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Change of Address]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Amend]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Withdrawal of Claim]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Statement]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Small Business Monthly Operating Report]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order on Application to Employ]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.